Friends of Queens Park Infant Academy

Charity number: 1001639
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £4.80k £5.05k £5.24k £6.29k £1.08k
Total expenditure £1.40k £2.10k £1.44k £8.29k £1.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A