Governing document Stowupland Friends of Freeman
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14TH SEPTEMBER 1989 AS AMENDED ON 25TH SEPTEMBER 1990 AND 15TH SEPTEMBER 1999 AS AMENDED ON 12 OCT 2017 as amended on 13 Oct 2020 as amended on 07 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT FREEMAN COMMUNITY PRIMARY SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES NOT REQUIRED TO BE PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL, THROUGH DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE STOWUPLAND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.