Accounts and annual returns WORLD CHARITY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1001979
Charity reporting is overdue by 1698 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 237 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 237 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 602 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 602 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 967 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 967 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1332 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1332 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1698 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1698 days