CHICKERELL PRIMARY ACADEMY PTA

Charity number: 1002576
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £16.05k £12.20k £14.02k £6.64k £4.24k
Total expenditure £14.45k £9.78k £16.06k £11.17k £2.86k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A