Accounts and annual returns ACE OF CLUBS MINIBUS PROJECT

Charity number: 1002648
Charity reporting is overdue by 1495 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 34 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 34 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 399 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 399 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 764 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 764 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1130 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1130 days
Annual return 31 December 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1495 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1495 days