YOUNG PERSONS ADVISORY SERVICE

Charity number: 1002706
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.56m £2.20m £1.85m £2.90m £3.91m
Total expenditure £1.14m £2.08m £2.10m £2.45m £3.81m
Income from government contracts £1.34m £1.84m N/A N/A £1.85m
Income from government grants £0 £145.07k £1.53m £1.35m £623.20k
Income - Donations and legacies £22.97k £22.81k £163.91k £111.54k £623.41k
Income - Other trading activities £2.00k £8.61k £8.88k £289 £772
Income - Charitable activities £1.54m £2.17m £1.68m £2.79m £3.29m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.13m £2.05m £2.10m £2.45m £3.81m
Expenditure - Raising funds £8.79k £22.24k £42 £0 £78
Expenditure - Governance £7.54k £8.26k £9.36k £0 £10.22k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £11.44k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0