Trustees HOMELESS PEOPLE AND THE OXFORD CHURCHES(GATEHOUSE)

Charity number: 1002741
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rupert Sheppard Trustee 03 November 2020
None on record
Piers Hugill Trustee 08 October 2019
None on record
Deirdre Garson Trustee 07 November 2018
None on record
Elizabeth Wade Trustee 07 November 2018
None on record
KEVIN BYRNE Trustee 05 September 2018
None on record
Rachel Parfitt Trustee 19 April 2016
None on record
MICHAEL RICHARD CROFTON-BRIGGS Trustee 28 November 2011
None on record
DR CATHERINE MARY DOLBEAR Trustee 03 June 2011
None on record