Financial history ST PETER'S HALL (1991) CHARITY

Charity number: 1003310
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £188.67k £206.42k £176.03k £155.81k £158.52k
Total expenditure £122.12k £110.66k £139.74k £136.22k £123.70k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £27.48k £2.42k