Accounts and annual returns HAMILTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1003482
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 January 2024 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 29 January 2024 363 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 January 2024 728 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2024 1093 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1631 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1631 days