THE ANGLICAN CENTRE IN ROME

Charity number: 1003666
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £570.40k £416.46k £484.35k £466.34k £175.18k
Total expenditure £552.30k £452.99k £436.74k £340.73k £275.70k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £328.65k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £177.78k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £55.89k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £6.58k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £8.08k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £393.71k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £158.59k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £7.37k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A