Governing document THE BENEVOLENT FUND OF THE COLLEGE OF OPTOMETRISTS & THE ASSOCIATION OF OPTOMETRISTS
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 15 APRIL 1981 AS AMENDED 8 MAY 1993, 10 MAY 1995 AND 31 DECEMBER 1999, 28 MARCH 2003 AND 11 DECEMBER 2006. AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 01 AUG 2018
Charitable objects
TO AFFORD ASSISTANCE BY APPLICATION OF THE INCOME OF THE FUND AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL AT SUCH TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE MANAGING TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF ALL OR ANY (A) NECESSITOUS MEMBERS AND FORMER MEMBERS (OF ANY CLASS) OF THE BRITISH COLLEGE OF OPTOMETRISTS OR FORMERLY OF THE BRITISH COLLEGE OF OPTOMETRISTS OR BRITISH COLLEGE OF OPTHALMIC OPTICIANS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS (B) FORMER MEMBERS OF THE BRITISH OPTICAL ASSOCIATION AND THEIR DEPENDANTS OR (C) MEMBERS AND FORMER MEMBERS OF THE ASSOCIATION OF OPTOMETRISTS (OR FORMERLY THE ASSOCIATION OF OPTICAL PRACTITIONERS) AND THEIR DEPENDANTS (D) FELLOWS BY EXAMINATION OF THE SCOTTISH ASSOCIATION OF OPTICIANS OT THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF SPECTACLE MAKERS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS OR (E) OTHER MEMBERS AND FORMER MEMBERS OF THE OPTICAL PROFESSION AND THEIR DEPENDANTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.