Financial history URBAN ADVENTURE SUPPORT GROUP

Charity number: 1003727
Charity reporting is overdue by 27 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £3.00k £3.00k £3.00k £3.00k £3.72k
Total expenditure £2.33k £3.53k £3.22k £669 £3.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A