Accounts and annual returns OAKLEY ACORN TRUST

Charity number: 1003777
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 15 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 25 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 29 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 17 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 27 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required