Accounts and annual returns THE ARTHUR CONNOLLY TRUST

Charity number: 1004536
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 27 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 17 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 17 February 2021 293 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 23 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 16 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required