Accounts and annual returns EMMANUEL CHRISTIAN CENTRE
Charity number: 1004896
Charity reporting is overdue by 426 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 60 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 60 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 426 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 426 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 26 June 2023 | 391 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 26 June 2023 | 391 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 26 June 2023 | 756 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 26 June 2023 | 756 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 05 July 2021 | 400 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 05 July 2021 | 400 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window