Financial history BITTERNE LOCAL HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity number: 1005127
Charity reporting is overdue by 16 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £20.15k £19.87k £35.51k £31.77k £25.52k
Total expenditure £23.93k £21.87k £20.27k £14.98k £6.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £10.00k N/A N/A