Trustees Hawk District Scout Council

Charity number: 1005128
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ian Terence Rowney Chair 17 May 2023
None on record
Victoria Edwards Trustee 17 April 2023
None on record
Peter Knott Trustee 26 September 2022
None on record
Mathew Brian Caney Trustee 15 June 2021
None on record
Dr Ian Alec Wright Trustee 15 June 2021
None on record
Julie Ann Stacey Trustee 12 October 2020
None on record
TIM PIKE Trustee
3RD HAYLING (BROTHERHOOD OWN) SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
PORTSMOUTH AND WINCHESTER DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION
Recently registered
MIKE HENWOOD Trustee
None on record