Trustees THEATR BRYCHEINIOG CYF
Charity number: 1005327
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Kenneth Redvers Collinson | Chair | 14 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jodie Rhoslyn Bond | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tab Wheeler | Trustee | 14 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Roderick Anthony Epstien Paton | Trustee | 14 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Ann Owen | Trustee | 25 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jean Jenkins | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Brian Austen Groombridge | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Frances Davies | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Jones | Trustee | 15 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Gary Stephen Blackledge | Trustee | 11 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH LYON JEFFREYS | Trustee | 11 March 2014 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.