Trustees THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE FAIRFORD HOSPITAL
Charity number: 1006416
Charity reporting is up to date (136 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shelley Welsh | Chair | 10 December 2018 |
|
|||||||||
David William Stanley Bird | Trustee | 10 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Valerie Harvey | Trustee | 11 October 2021 |
|
|||||||||
ROBERT JOHN READ | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|||||||||
ANDRENA MARGARET MILES | Trustee | 11 December 2017 |
|
|||||||||
JEFFREY BARRY DAWSON | Trustee | 05 September 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr GRAHAM IAN WALLIS | Trustee | 20 October 2011 |
|
|||||||||
RUTH HARTWELL BERRIDGE | Trustee | 20 October 2011 |
|
|||||||||
MARGARET PURSCH | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.