THE FRIENDS OF ST NICHOLAS STEVENAGE

Charity number: 1006512
Charity reporting is overdue by 84 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £218 £10.23k £265 £5.23k £10.98k
Total expenditure £0 £1.00k £0 £10.00k £16.44k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A