TEDBURN ST MARY CHURCH LANDS CHARITY

Charity number: 1006601
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 28 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 11 March 2020 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 08 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 12 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 22 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required