Trustees ALDERLEY EDGE SCHOOL FOR GIRLS
Charity number: 1006726
Charity reporting is up to date (265 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEITH RONALD LOWE | Chair | 07 July 2009 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stephen Burley | Trustee | 11 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Wright | Trustee | 12 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rita Price | Trustee | 05 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Graham Bryant | Trustee | 05 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jo Rostron | Trustee | 16 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Lowe | Trustee | 07 September 2010 |
|
|
||||
MRS SHIRLEY HERRING | Trustee | 01 September 1999 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.