Trustees COCKERMOUTH AFTER SCHOOL SCHEME
Charity number: 1006822
Charity reporting is up to date (91 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie Friend | Chair | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Page | Trustee | 20 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Collins | Trustee | 23 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Pearson | Trustee | 19 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Caroline Griffiths | Trustee | 13 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Robert Ian Griffiths | Trustee | 13 April 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.