Trustees LLANTARNAM GRANGE ARTS CENTRE
Charity number: 1006933
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alan Slade | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Lloyd-Tolman | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Jane Fenton | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Watkins | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Williams | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Naseem Tanya Syed | Trustee | 03 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Toni Pestana De Jesus | Trustee | 03 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Burge | Trustee | 03 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kim Colebrook | Trustee | 03 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Russell Browne | Trustee | 30 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Mary James | Trustee | 30 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
VERONICA CRICK | Trustee | 12 July 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.