Trustees MILTON KEYNES PARKS TRUST LIMITED
Charity number: 1007183
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nick Lloyd | Chair | 07 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rupa Green | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Graham Webster | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martina Gorla | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Kingston | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carla Velterop-Martin | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yoseph Araya | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Tim Dolder | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Smith | Trustee | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robin Bradburn | Trustee | 30 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Townsend | Trustee | 30 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Sheppard | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert David Green | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ian Burgess | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Bridgman | Trustee | 11 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ian Jackson | Trustee | 07 November 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.