Financial history R G HILLS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1008914
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £121.67k £136.03k £354.66k £159.01k £129.58k
Total expenditure £145.49k £167.17k £169.90k £173.01k £100.54k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £3.13k