Trustees ADDINGHAM CIVIC SOCIETY
Charity number: 1009758
Charity reporting is overdue by 58 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gary Copping | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mike Williams | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Keating | Trustee | 17 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Roger Seddon | Trustee | 17 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carole Jayne Hood | Trustee | 16 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Glynne Walton | Trustee | 18 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Steve Lloyd | Trustee | 03 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Keeble | Trustee | 03 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Gill Battarbee | Trustee | 14 November 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.