Trustees L'ASSOCIATION DES JURISTES FRANCO-BRITANNIQUES/THE FRANCO-BRITISH LAWYERS SOCIETY LIMITED
Charity number: 1010089
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
29 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ADVOCATE IAN STEWART FORRESTER KC | Chair | 29 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Catherine PEDAMON | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lord Ericht Andrew Fleming Stewart | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephane Michel Rene Bonifassi | Trustee | 28 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Diane Le Grand de Belleroche | Trustee | 24 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES PIERRE OLIVIER JEAN RENE ED du COUEDIC de KERERANT | Trustee | 29 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Pearson Aikens | Trustee | 20 October 2016 |
|
|||||
MICHELLE ANNE CULLY | Trustee | 26 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
LEONARDO CARPENTIERI | Trustee | 24 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Nicolas JONDET | Trustee | 02 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID GUILD | Trustee | 26 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN CLARK | Trustee | 02 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE PALMER | Trustee | 02 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
FREDERIC GOLDBERG | Trustee | 02 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
MAITRE IRENE ARNAUDEAU | Trustee | 19 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
VIVIENNE FORREST | Trustee | 19 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
MAITRE BEATRICE CASTELLANE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAITRE DENIS LAVOIR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FIONNUALA ANNE CONNOLLY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MADAME KATHERINE DANDRIEUX LISFRANC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAITRE BERNARD VATIER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LADY LEEONA JUNE DORRIAN QC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STANLEY CHANEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MONSIEUR ARISTIDE LEVI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROLE HOPE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT JAMES DAFYDD STEVENSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAITRE CAROL XUEREF | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SALLY OSBORN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SANDRINE DELARUE PRADAYROL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.