Financial history THE CHARITY OF THE REVEREND CHARLES HENRY CHASE

Charity number: 1010652
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £5.76k £6.04k £6.20k £8.28k £8.99k
Total expenditure £12.57k £9.00k £5.00k £12.00k £6.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A