Trustees FITZROY SUPPORT
Charity number: 1011290
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Kyndt | Chair | 23 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Edwina Jane Johnston | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathon Derrick Altham | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarju Mistry | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Saad Samir Sayeed | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Carol Whetton | Trustee | 28 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Neil Ramsay Blackley | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Andrew Philip Gore | Trustee | 21 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark Andrew Sanderson | Trustee | 11 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Caroline Jacobs | Trustee | 23 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Derrick McCourt | Trustee | 03 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Evans | Trustee | 22 September 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.