Financial history ILAM SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1011378
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £6.12k £7.47k £2.54k £1.78k £4.52k
Total expenditure £6.80k £7.72k £3.20k £4.44k £2.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A