Accounts and annual returns LUTON AND DISTRICT STAFF WELFARE FUND

Charity number: 1011610
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2021 14 December 2021 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 14 December 2021 379 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 14 December 2021 745 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2018 28 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2017 11 January 2018 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 Not Required