Trustees SOLIHULL UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE
Charity number: 1012048
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mary Josephine Scott | Trustee | 26 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jill Margaret Park | Trustee | 26 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ann Christine Berry | Trustee | 26 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Antonia Kidson | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Vera Alicia Gilbert | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Derek Gilbert Hoskins | Trustee | 24 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Charles Roff | Trustee | 24 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Powell | Trustee | 27 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Elizabeth Hoskins | Trustee | 10 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
John Phillips | Trustee | 19 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
Alistair Kerr Scott | Trustee | 19 September 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.