Trustees THE NATIONAL YOUTH ADVOCACY SERVICE

Charity number: 1012485
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sir Mark Hedley Chair 09 December 2020
TRANSFORMING CHOICE
Received: 41 days late
Scott Roger Cormack Trustee 28 February 2024
None on record
Norman Terrance Galloway Trustee 16 March 2022
None on record
Martha Cover Trustee 11 December 2019
None on record
Roy Jones MBE Trustee 29 June 2016
THEATR CLWYD TRUST LTD
Received: On time
MARTYN JAMES BEST Trustee 09 June 2015
ROYAL COURT LIVERPOOL TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
TRANMERE ROVERS IN THE COMMUNITY
Received: 12 days late
ANNESLEY WRIGHT Trustee 11 March 2014
WREXHAM FOYER
Received: On time
ADOPTION MATTERS
Received: On time
THE WISEMAN MEMORIAL FUND
Received: On time
JUDITH TIMMS OBE Trustee 07 October 2011
None on record