Governing document WCS CARE GROUP LIMITED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/05/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/08/2000 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 04/12/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/12/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/01/2010
Charitable objects
TO CARE FOR ELDERLY PEOPLE, PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES AND PEOPLE WITH SPECIAL NEEDS LIVING IN THE WARWICKSHIRE COMMUNITY AND ELSEWHERE IN ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
WARWICKSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.