Trustees 2ND KIMBERLEY SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1012853
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Cass | Chair | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Stearman | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Edward James Roberts | Trustee | 06 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Darren Rungapadiachy | Trustee | 06 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Whittall | Trustee | 11 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Greenfield | Trustee | 09 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosalind Broker | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ellis Tansley | Trustee | 16 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jane Maltby | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Richard Maltby | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.