THE UKANA MATERNITY HOSPITAL PROJECT

Charity number: 1012893
Charity reporting is overdue by 1466 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2010 31/01/2011 31/01/2012 31/01/2013 31/01/2014
Total gross income £100 £0 £0 £0 £10
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A