ELTISLEY REST HOME

Charity number: 1013149
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £3.14k £3.17k £3.23k £3.29k £3.34k
Total expenditure £396 £657 £230 £445 £1.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A