Financial history FRIENDS OF ABBEY FEDERATION

Charity number: 1013178
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £8.94k £7.41k £10.71k £11.22k £2.41k
Total expenditure £7.25k £7.98k £2.07k £1.18k £2.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A