Financial history JURIS ANGLIAE SCIENTIA LIMITED

Charity number: 1013738
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £120.46k £202.17k £170.70k £166.12k £210.03k
Total expenditure £181.19k £162.68k £135.65k £136.24k £206.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A