1ST MORDEN SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1013739
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £2.47k £3.01k £7.67k £7.57k £4.53k
Total expenditure £4.32k £3.99k £3.93k £4.48k £5.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A