Trustees BATH AREA PLAY PROJECT
Charity number: 1013897
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tania Swift | Chair | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ben Price | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Baz Harding-Clark | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Hill | Trustee | 05 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carly McKeever | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Bogg | Trustee | 23 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joan Cooper | Trustee | 21 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Emma Hendy | Trustee | 30 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Vicky Heslop | Trustee | 30 March 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.