Financial history SPRINGBOARD PROJECT

Charity number: 1014270
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £513.44k £453.10k £374.87k £412.83k £355.11k
Total expenditure £512.65k £493.82k £320.82k £330.00k £331.64k
Income from government contracts £139.08k £143.81k £134.84k £128.68k £95.00k
Income from government grants £22.36k £12.50k £14.73k £79.57k £24.50k
Income - Donations and legacies £383.83k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £14.37k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £104.20k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £47 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £11.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £479.61k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £33.04k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £30.91k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A