Governance FEDERATION OF ESSEX WOMEN'S INSTITUTES
Charity number: 1014445
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 25 September 1992: Standard registration
- 07 June 2021: Funds received from 1030434 SOUTH HANNINGFIELD WOMENS INSTITUTE
- 15 September 2021: Funds received from 285689 SAFFRON WALDEN AFTERNOON WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
- 18 March 2022: Funds received from 1072781 CHURCH LANGLEY WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
- 08 April 2022: Funds received from 1030435 THE MAPLESTEAD WOMENS INSTITUTE
- 22 April 2024: Funds received from 1024191 FEERING WOMENS INSTITUTE
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
- THE ESSEX COUNTY FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.