Financial history TRINITY COLLEGE LONDON

Charity number: 1014792
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £54.12m £57.91m £55.95m £33.88m £40.74m
Total expenditure £51.33m £54.60m £53.38m £35.90m £41.13m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £60.20k N/A N/A £424.70k £9.77k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £305.00k £2.11m £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £53.87m £57.51m £53.45m £33.42m £40.73m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £27.00k £87.00k £175.00k £36.00k £5.00k
Income - Other £220.00k £0 £219.00k £424.70k £10.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £51.33m £54.60m £53.38m £35.90m £41.13m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £54.00k £72.00k £155.00k £171.00k £190.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £1.52m £1.54m £1.00m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0