NEW KADAMPA TRADITION - INTERNATIONAL KADAMPA BUDDHIST UNION

Charity number: 1015054
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £4.37m £4.57m £6.87m £5.99m £4.44m
Total expenditure £2.26m £3.53m £3.01m £3.29m £369.53k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £25.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £575.90k £1.44m £3.02m £2.66m £977.66k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £3.51m £3.12m £3.86m £3.33m £3.46m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £282.80k £5.82k £579 £692 £327
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.26m £3.53m £3.01m £3.29m £369.53k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance -£451.12k £48.53k £11.58k £241.29k -£302.64k
Expenditure - Grants institution £475.04k £1.26m £286.13k £279.58k £470.64k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0