BRITISH MENOPAUSE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1015144
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £394.55k £496.71k £485.93k £503.16k £334.05k
Total expenditure £398.33k £454.91k £412.08k £426.83k £325.76k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £9.94k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £8.54k N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £484.49k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £206 N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £186.28k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £240.56k N/A