Trustees DEREK WILLIAMS TRUST
Charity number: 1015251
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rosemary Claire Evans | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brendan Edward James Sadka | Trustee | 09 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Sian Llinos Williams | Trustee | 09 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN MYLES DAVIES | Trustee | 24 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
JAMES RONALD SEATON | Trustee | 24 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN THOMAS-FERRAND | Trustee | 24 April 2003 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM WILKINS CBE, DL | Trustee | 10 October 2000 |
|
|
||||
HOWARD JOHN EVANS | Trustee | 21 October 1992 |
|
|
||||
JOAN WINTER | Trustee | 21 October 1992 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.