Trustees BISHOP OF ROCHESTERS FUND FOR MISSION
Charity number: 1015300
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
The Ven Alison Mary Kerr | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||
The Rt Rev Dr Jonathan Robert Gibbs | Trustee | 24 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Archdeacon Sharon Louise Copestake | Trustee | 16 January 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||
Jeremy James King | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||
The Rev Canon Jeremy Augustine Blunden | Trustee | 13 November 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||
Rev MARTYN LEONARD JOHN SAUNDERS | Trustee | 04 November 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||
Nigel Pope | Trustee | 23 June 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||
Alan Strachan | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||
The Rev Dr Julie Elizabeth Bowen | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||
David Roy Fitzpatrick | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||
Gerald Michael O'Brien | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||
The Ven Andrew David Wooding Jones | Trustee | 11 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||
The Very Rev. Dr. Philip John Hesketh | Trustee | 21 June 2017 |
|
|||||||||||||
The Rev Canon MARK BARKER | Trustee | 21 June 2017 |
|
|||||||||||||
Sarah Poole | Trustee | 21 June 2017 |
|
|||||||||||||
PHILIP COLIN FRENCH | Trustee | 25 January 2013 |
|
|||||||||||||
THE RIGHT REVEREND SIMON DAVID BURTON-JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.