LONDON NIGHTLINE AT ULU

Charity number: 1015744
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £103.55k £104.71k £127.14k £139.72k £127.77k
Total expenditure £85.40k £87.20k £109.65k £120.07k £106.57k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A